Brcic, Branimir (CPSO#: 63898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 144
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 491-5900
Fax: (416) 491-1149
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANIMIR BRCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRCIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992