Breakey, Vicky Rowena (CPSO#: 77876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: Sventzouris, Vicky Rowena (used until: 24 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West, HSC 3N27a
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-1703
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICKY ROWENA BREAKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREAKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009