Breau, Rodney Henry (CPSO#: 79328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 222
Room L2154
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73019
Fax: (613) 739-6842
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodney Breau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Breau ( CPSO# 79328 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 222
Suite L2154
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODNEY HENRY BREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010