Breetvelt, Elemi Job (CPSO#: 111918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 29 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Leiden, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
8Nu - 802
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5145
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEMI JOB BREETVELT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BREETVELT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BREETVELT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BREETVELT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BREETVELT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BREETVELT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BREETVELT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2017