Bremang, Joseph Asante (CPSO#: 42400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 6090
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Bremang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bremang ( CPSO# 42400 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6090

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ASANTE BREMANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREMANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990