Bremermann, Ruth Danielle Michaud (CPSO#: 68829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: Michaud, Ruth Danielle (used until: 28 May 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Fax: (905) 842-3604
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH DANIELLE MICHAUD BREMERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREMERMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1997