Brenken, Ernst Georg (CPSO#: 55504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
170 The Donway West
Toronto ON  M3C 2G3
Phone: (416) 515-7538
Fax: (416) 515-7538
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Brenken Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Brenken ( CPSO# 55504 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
200 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 515-7538

Business Address:
Suite 401
170 The Donway West
Toronto ON  M3C 2G3
Phone Number: (416) 515-7538

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNST GEORG BRENKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENKEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1986