Brennan, Brenda Kathleen (CPSO#: 64691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone: (613) 826-2502
Fax: (613) 826-1682
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. & B. Brennan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Brennan ( CPSO# 64691 )
Dr. T. Brennan ( CPSO# 57638 )

Business Address:
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone Number: (613) 826-2502

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA KATHLEEN BRENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENNAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1991