Brennan, Cressida Evelyn Robina (CPSO#: 96606)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Medical Imaging The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 11 Jun 2014

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2014