Brennan, Frederick James (CPSO#: 24017)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015