Brennan, Michael Charles (CPSO#: 57289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Fax: (905) 984-5578
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Canada
Phone: (877) 849-3637
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael C. Brennan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brennan ( CPSO# 57289 )

Business Address:
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4V6
Phone Number: (877) 849-3637

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHARLES BRENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENNAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1992