Brennan, Michael Kevin (CPSO#: 54110)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6253
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital Department of Pathology 4001 Leslie Street Toronto, ON M2K 1E1
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018