Brennan, Stefan Denis (CPSO#: 80536)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 329-20th St W Saskatoon, SK S7M 0X1
Date Received: 31 Jul 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017