Brenneman, Frederick Don (CPSO#: 59446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite H-170
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4232
Fax: (416) 480-4225
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenneman Chu Tien Tremblay Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )
Dr. F. Brenneman ( CPSO# 59446 )
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 62432 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK DON BRENNEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENNEMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989