Brereton, Sheila Mary (CPSO#: 55999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5N 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8144
Fax: (905) 820-1631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Brereton and Dr. Andrew Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Brereton and Dr. Andrew Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moran ( CPSO# 55998 )
Dr. S. Brereton ( CPSO# 55999 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-9148

Business Address:
406 - 2299 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA MARY BRERETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRERETON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1990