Breslavets, Maksym Valeriyovych (CPSO#: 95302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Dundas St. West
unit 200
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 493-5700
Fax: (905) 493-1170
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ferry Street Medical
5845 Ferry Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S8
Canada
Phone: (905) 354-8616
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Ferry Street Medical
5845 Ferry Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S8
Canada
Phone: (905) 354-8616
Fax: (289) 296-7156
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maksym Breslavets Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Breslavets ( CPSO# 95302 )

Business Address:
Unit 200
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7

Business Address:
7600 Weston Road
Unit 55
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone Number: (289) 371-3500

Business Address:
9325 Yonge Street
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 509-9976

Business Address:
Suite 312
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 883-7997

Business Address:
Ferry Street Medical
5845 Ferry Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S8
Phone Number: (905) 354-8616

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAKSYM VALERIYOVYCH BRESLAVETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRESLAVETS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015