Bressler, Hartley Brian (CPSO#: 66913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4839 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K8
Phone: (416) 498-3600
Fax: (416) 498-1211
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 209
801 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 1X7
Canada
Phone: (416) 699-8843
Fax: (416) 699-6094
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARTLEY BRIAN BRESSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRESSLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1997