Breton, Chantal (CPSO#: 58979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GMF au 55
55, avenue de l.Église
Montréal
Montreal QC  H4G 3E7
Phone: (514) 737-2496
Fax: (514) 733-2759
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasalle Walk-in- Clinic
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-2933
Fax: (705) 222-2238
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Statcare Walk-in-Clinic
175 Stillview road, Suite 104
Pointe-Claire
montreal QC  H9H 4S3
Canada
Phone: (514) 694-9282
Fax: (514) 697-0192
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL BRETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1988 to 31 Jan 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1988