Brezina, Jeanie Shkimba (CPSO#: 18854)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1963
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 14 Feb 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 22 May 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012