Bricker, David John (CPSO#: 67842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2909 Grandview Street
Windsor ON  N8T 2L5
Phone: (519) 251-1878
Fax: (519) 251-1665
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN BRICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRICKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996