Brien, Heather Jane Caroline (CPSO#: 67428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 old bronte Rd suite 480
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 339-2498
Fax: (905) 339-1886
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2008


Corporation Name: Brien Orfi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Orfi ( CPSO# 66046 )
Dr. H. Brien ( CPSO# 67428 )

Business Address:
300-1 - 690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Suite 409
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Palermo Professional Centre
340/480 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 339-2498

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JANE CAROLINE BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993