Brien, Steven Richard (CPSO#: 33382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6851
Fax: (705) 740-6899
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. R. Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brien ( CPSO# 33382 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN RICHARD BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982