Brien, William Francis (CPSO#: 43219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8N-885
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M4G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4069
Fax: (416) 340-3799
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lifelabs
100 international
Toronto ON  M9W6J6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William F. Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brien ( CPSO# 43219 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 3652
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
University Hospital Network
Room 8N-885
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4069

Business Address:
Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985