Briggs, Kaleigh Teresa (CPSO#: 108077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALEIGH TERESA BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017