Briggs, Robert Francis (CPSO#: 16008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004