Brigham, Sarah Irene (CPSO#: 82606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Centre
1650 Queensdale Avenue, Unit 2
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: 6132444400
Fax: 6132443399
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Brigham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brigham ( CPSO# 82606 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4526

Business Address:
1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone Number: (613) 244-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH IRENE BRIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Dec 2006 to 11 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Dec 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008