Brikeet, Yasser Abdulrhman Salem (CPSO#: 82392)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 May 2005 to 24 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008