Bril, Vera (CPSO#: 28851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
5Ec-309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3315
Fax: (416) 340-4189
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vera Bril Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017


Corporation Name: V Bril Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bril ( CPSO# 28851 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5EC309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERA BRIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1976