Brill, Francine (CPSO#: 56969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Prospect St. #302
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (289) 803-2533
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weisbrot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weisbrot ( CPSO# 55753 )
Dr. F. Brill ( CPSO# 56969 )

Business Address:
York-Med Medical Arts Building
404 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCINE BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988