Brine, Meggan Ashleigh (CPSO#: 93780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meggan Brine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brine ( CPSO# 93780 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGGAN ASHLEIGH BRINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013