Briones-Urbina, Rosario (CPSO#: 58829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
3rd floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSARIO BRIONES-URBINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIONES-URBINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jul 1992