Briscoe, Maureen Phyllis (CPSO#: 19697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Day, Maureen Phyllis (used until: 14 Dec 1981 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009