Brison, Robert James (CPSO#: 31153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Depart't / Urgent Care
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: (613) 548-1381
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moffatt Brison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moffatt ( CPSO# 51223 )
Dr. R. Brison ( CPSO# 31153 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES BRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1979