Brisson, Dennis Anthony Thomas (CPSO#: 16703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1958

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Jan 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2163 Victoria Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1P8
Phone: (519) 253-2710
Fax: (519) 258-0336
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1958
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]

            As from December 24, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dennis Anthony Thomas
            Brisson, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Brisson to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Dennis Anthony Thomas Brisson may not be the Most Responsible
                  Physician for any patient whatsoever and may only practice as a surgical
                  assistant under the direction of a surgeon who is approved by the
                  College, effective January 31, 2014.