Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Brister, Stephanie Jo (CPSO#: 57402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JO BRISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1988