Bristow, Robbie Glen (CPSO#: 65453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2936
Fax: (416) 946-4442
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robbie Bristow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bristow ( CPSO# 65453 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiation Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBBIE GLEN BRISTOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISTOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993