Britten, Carolyn Dolores (CPSO#: 65232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical University of
South Carolina
MSC 635
39 Sabin Street
Charleston SC  29425
United States
Phone: (843) 792-4271
Fax: (843) 792-0644

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN DOLORES BRITTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993