Britten, Heather Frances (CPSO#: 67870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Teen Health Centre
101-1361 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor ON  N8X 1J6
Phone: (519) 253-8481
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Student Health Centre
University of Windsor
401 Sunset
Windsor ON  N8W 2P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 253-4232 Ext. 7002
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Britten ( CPSO# 67870 )

Business Address:
University Student Centre
401 Sunset Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 2P6
Phone Number: (519) 253-4232

Business Address:
Teen Health Centre
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 101
Windsor ON  N8X 1J6
Phone Number: (519) 253-8481

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER FRANCES BRITTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996