Britton, William Alan Arthur (CPSO#: 32909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone: (613) 722-1517
Fax: (613) 722-4811
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospitals
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospitals
General Campus
Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8222
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William A. Britton Jr. Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Britton ( CPSO# 32909 )

Business Address:
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-1517

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALAN ARTHUR BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1981