Britton-Foster, Michael Barry (CPSO#: 50201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.B. Britton-Foster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Britton-Foster ( CPSO# 50201 )

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X4
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 848-3673

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BARRY BRITTON-FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON-FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)