Brockway, Wade Frank Arthur (CPSO#: 86758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Special Operations Forces
Command Headquarters
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-2097
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-613
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospi
33 Drummond St W
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Canada
Phone: 613-267-1500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Carleton Place & District Memorial
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613- 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wade Brockway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brockway ( CPSO# 86758 )

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADE FRANK ARTHUR BROCKWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROCKWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009