Brode, Sarah Kathleen (CPSO#: 86710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
Department of Respiratory Medicine
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3631
Fax: (416) 243-3696
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Asthma and Airway Centre
7 East - Room 453
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5767
Fax: (416) 603-5375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN BRODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012