Broder, Sarah Lynn (CPSO#: 62526)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2000