Brodie, Richard James (CPSO#: 56731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 1L1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: (416) 285-3846
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients may access copies of their medical records by contacting Record Xpress at (416) 849-5991 or http://www.recordxpress.ca/
Date Received: 12 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES BRODIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988