Broemling, Natasha Vallini (CPSO#: 85642)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010