Bronson, David William (CPSO#: 50204)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Bronson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: P O box 795 Timmins, ON P4N 7G7
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015


Address: P O Box 795 Timmins, ON P4N 7G7
Date Received: 19 Jan 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015