Brook, John Roger (CPSO#: 16892)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1958
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 May 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Roger Brook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2016:

Dr. Brook was the subject of a complaint about his conduct and his standard of practice in his family practice. During the investigation, Dr. Brook resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)