Brooker, Stuart Gordon (CPSO#: 56916)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 2006