Brooks, James Stewart (CPSO#: 19563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-2558 Ext. 246
Fax: (905) 688-4678
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: P O Box 566 Virgil, ON L0S 1T0
Date Received: 18 Jan 2011

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 3, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On Novermber 18, 2010, Niagara Health System notified the College that Dr. James Stewart Brooks's privileges were suspended, effective November 3, 2010.

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES STEWART BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017