Brooks, Kathleen Mary (CPSO#: 56732)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017